Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2005 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20916 Week
» 85870 Month
» 288534 Year
» 3315387 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3808 |
16/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08641 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1979 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
29/05/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3808 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08641 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|