Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 805 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14211 Week
» 67227 Month
» 186754 Year
» 3213607 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3835 |
02/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08668 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
02/01/1960 to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
Withdrawn |
02/04/1997 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs , 3 mths |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3835 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08668 |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
02/04/1997 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|