Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 164 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17967 Week
» 70983 Month
» 190510 Year
» 3217363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3846 |
08/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08679 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1974 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1974 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3846 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08679 |
|
|
22/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
19/06/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08679 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
04/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|