Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1505 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19308 Week
» 72324 Month
» 191851 Year
» 3218704 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D385 |
28/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40185 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
28/03/1962 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
08/08/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
2yrs overdue for a classified repair,power unit problems |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
28/03/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
15/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
15/11/1972 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D385 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
04/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40185 |
|
|
08/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40185 |
|
|
12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|