Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1584 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14990 Week
» 68006 Month
» 187533 Year
» 3214386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3862 |
28/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08695 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3862 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08695 |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08695 |
|
|
12/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|