Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D388 |
18/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40188 |
16/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
18/04/1962 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
31/08/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
07/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Too costly to repair defective power unit |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
18/04/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D388 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40188 |
|
|
31/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40188 |
|
|
07/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|