Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2279 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20082 Week
» 73098 Month
» 192625 Year
» 3219478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3926 |
08/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08758 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/02/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/10/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3926 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
05/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08758 |
|
|
13/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08758 |
|
|
08/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|