Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4699 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18742 Week
» 83696 Month
» 286360 Year
» 3313213 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3970 |
11/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08802 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
11/06/1960 to St Blazey (83E) |
Cut Up |
on |
Status |
In Service |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3970 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
19/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08802 |
|
|