Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 806 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18609 Week
» 71625 Month
» 191152 Year
» 3218005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D399 |
05/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40199 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
05/09/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
13/06/1982 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Fire damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/09/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/02/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/02/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/09/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D399 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
07/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
22/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
29/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40199 |
|
|
13/06/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40199 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|