Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 290 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4267 Week
» 15504 Month
» 248424 Year
» 1913800 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3997 08/10/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08829 07/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0808/10/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 08/10/1960 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawn 16/06/1993 off Toton (TO)
Time in Service 32 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 28/02/2005
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) on 08/10/1960
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 03/12/1960
84G Kidderminster 4w/e 31/12/1960
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
16A Toton w/e 16/12/1967
   Withdrawn on 16/06/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
06/1976   Air Braked only        
06/1976   Vacuum Brakes removed        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
08/10/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3997
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
16/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
07/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08829    
06/1976 Modification Modification: Air Braked only    
06/1976 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed    
16/06/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08829 from Toton (TO)    
28/02/2005 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth    

prev prev