Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2197 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15603 Week
» 68619 Month
» 188146 Year
» 3214999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1290 |
m/e |
12/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
11217 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
51217 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1153 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
26 |
To Service |
During 12/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 03/11/1961 (At Crewe Works) |
Withdrawal Notes |
At Crewe Works |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1948 |
North Sunderland Railway |
The ex L. & Y. 0-4-0T, No. 11217, which is on loan to Tweedmouth, has been working on the North Sunderland Rly. |
SLS/194901 |
30/04/1960 |
Aspinall 0-4-0ST |
With regard to the Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 0F 0-4-0ST locos.; at the time of writing these are still well represented, with a total of fourteen in stock, distributed as follows : Agecroft 51204 an 51207 (26B), Bank Hall 51206, 51227, 51229, 51232, 51237, 51246 an 51253 (27A), Goole 51222, 51241 an 51244 (50D), and Bristol Barrow Road 51217 an 51218 (82E). |
SLS/196006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1290 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11217 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Burton (17B) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51217 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (21C) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
11/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51217 |
|
|