Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1143 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18946 Week
» 71962 Month
» 191489 Year
» 3218342 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
1539 |
m/e |
10/1881 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1273 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
British Railways |
58040 |
|
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1532 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 10/1881 to Belle Vue (21) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/03/1955 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1895 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
05/10/1946 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1881 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 1539 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Belle Vue (21) |
|
|
04/1892 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29) |
|
|
04/1895 |
Modification |
Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
06/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1273 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (M14) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (M14) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (15D) |
|
|
05/10/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58040 |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (23A) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (15D) |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58040 |
|
|