Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16058 Week
» 69074 Month
» 188601 Year
» 3215454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
1322 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1341 |
m/e |
12/1907 |
British Railways |
58054 |
|
12/08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1532 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 02/1892 to Mansfield (18M) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 03/12/1955 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/09/1939 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 1322 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Mansfield (18M) |
|
|
04/1892 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (21) |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mansfield (18M) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mansfield (18M) |
|
|
12/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1341 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (18) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (18) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (18) |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (M18) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (M18) |
|
|
09/09/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mansfield (16D) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
12/08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58054 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (15D) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58054 |
|
|