Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 926 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14332 Week
» 67348 Month
» 186875 Year
» 3213728 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2620 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1420 |
m/e |
07/1907 |
British Railways |
58083 |
|
03/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3907 |
To Service |
During 07/1900 to Lancaster Green Ayre (32) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 05/10/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/09/1925 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
28/12/1946 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2620 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3907 Allocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (32) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lancaster Green Ayre (32) |
|
|
07/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1420 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lancaster Green Ayre (32) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (28) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
06/09/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (M1) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (MR) (20) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
28/12/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58083 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58083 |
|
|