Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 885 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14291 Week
» 67307 Month
» 186834 Year
» 3213687 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2622 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1422 |
m/e |
07/1907 |
British Railways |
58085 |
|
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3909 |
To Service |
During 08/1900 to Brecon (5) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 18/04/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1923 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
28/01/1928 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2622 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3909 Allocated to Brecon (5) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
07/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1422 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
06/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
28/01/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58085 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58085 |
|
|