Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 3172 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17215 Week
» 82169 Month
» 284833 Year
» 3311686 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2629 |
m/e |
09/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1429 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
British Railways |
58090 |
|
07/10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3916 |
To Service |
During 09/1900 to Derby (1) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 21/03/1953 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
1 |
|
Derby (New) |
m/e |
09/1900 |
1 |
|
Derby |
m/e |
12/1902 (Snapshot) |
1 |
|
Derby |
m/e |
05/1908 (Snapshot) |
1 |
|
Derby |
m/e |
04/1914 (Snapshot) |
1 |
|
Derby |
m/e |
12/1921 (Snapshot) |
M1 |
|
Derby |
m/e |
03/1930 (Snapshot) |
M1 |
|
Derby |
m/e |
09/1933 (Snapshot) |
17A |
|
Derby |
m/e |
11/1945 (Snapshot) |
23A |
|
Skipton |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/10/1927 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
09/10/1927 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2629 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3916 Allocated to Derby (1) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (1) |
|
|
11/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1429 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (1) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (1) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (1) |
|
|
09/10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
09/10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (M1) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (M1) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58090 |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (23A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58090 |
|
|