Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3462 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16868 Week
» 69884 Month
» 189411 Year
» 3216264 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2630 |
m/e |
09/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1430 |
m/e |
08/1907 |
British Railways |
58091 |
|
26/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3917 |
To Service |
During 09/1900 to Bourne (10B) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 03/11/1956 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1911 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
28/12/1924 |
LMS 'C1' boiler fitted |
06/11/1927 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2630 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3917 Allocated to Bourne (10B) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bourne (10B) |
|
|
08/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1430 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9) |
|
|
08/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
28/12/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C1' boiler fitted |
|
|
06/11/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58091 |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58091 |
|
|