Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 589 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13995 Week
» 67011 Month
» 186538 Year
» 3213391 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
38 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8512 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28512 |
m/e |
06/1942 |
British Railways |
58396 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Cauliflowers |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4005 |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/08/1953 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 38 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4005 |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8512 |
|
|
06/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28512 |
|
|
13/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58396 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
29/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58396 |
|
|