Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 497 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5484 Week
» 13599 Month
» 141042 Year
» 1806418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 534   03/1877
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 11307   1924
British Railways 51307   02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall
Class 568
Company History LYR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2503/1877
23 (0-6-0ST)05/1891
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 2115
To Service During 03/1877
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/11/1957
Service Life 80 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1877
23A   Bank Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 22/03/1952
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 19/04/1952
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 23/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23A Bank Hall w/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   w/e 23/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1898 Reboilered
01/1917 Reboilered


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1877 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 534
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2115
   
09/1898 Modification Modification: Reboilered    
01/1917 Modification Modification: Reboilered    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11307    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51307    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51307    

prev prev