Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 565 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3491 Week
» 5229 Month
» 132672 Year
» 1798048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 544   02/1878
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 11343   1924
British Railways 51343   03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall
Class 568
Company History LYR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2502/1878
23 (0-6-0ST)10/1892
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 2129
To Service During 02/1878
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/01/1960
Service Life 81 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1878
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 30/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   w/e 30/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1898 Reboilered
09/1912 Reboilered


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/08/1959 Last L.Y.R. 2F 0-6-0ST\'s At the time of writing, there are twenty-three ex-L.Y.R. Class 2F 0-6-0STs in stock, including five Departmental locomotives and these are allocated as follows: Edge Hill 51445 (8A), Sutton Oak 51441 (8G), Gorton 51319 (9G), Fleetwood 51336, 51419 an 51524 (24F), Newton Heath 51343 an 51371 (26A), Agecroft 51413 an 51496 (26B), Bolton 51408, 51486 an 51498 (26C), Mirfield 51358 (56D), Crewe Works 51412, 51444 an 51446 (CW), and finally Horwich Works 51429 (HW), plus Service Locos. 11304, 11305, 11324, 11368 an 11394. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1878 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 544
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2129
   
07/1898 Modification Modification: Reboilered    
09/1912 Modification Modification: Reboilered    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11343    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51343    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
30/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 51343    

prev prev