Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17391 Week
» 70407 Month
» 189934 Year
» 3216787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
549 |
|
02/1878 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11358 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51358 |
|
26/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
Works Number |
2134 |
To Service |
During 02/1878 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 23/10/1959 |
Service Life |
81 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/08/1959 |
Last L.Y.R. 2F 0-6-0ST\'s |
At the time of writing, there are twenty-three ex-L.Y.R. Class 2F 0-6-0STs in stock, including five Departmental locomotives and these are allocated as follows: Edge Hill 51445 (8A), Sutton Oak 51441 (8G), Gorton 51319 (9G), Fleetwood 51336, 51419 an 51524 (24F), Newton Heath 51343 an 51371 (26A), Agecroft 51413 an 51496 (26B), Bolton 51408, 51486 an 51498 (26C), Mirfield 51358 (56D), Crewe Works 51412, 51444 an 51446 (CW), and finally Horwich Works 51429 (HW), plus Service Locos. 11304, 11305, 11324, 11368 an 11394. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1878 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 549 Built at Kitson, Works Number 2134 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11358 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51358 |
|
|
23/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51358 |
|
|