Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1263 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14669 Week
» 67685 Month
» 187212 Year
» 3214065 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
574 |
|
09/1880 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11397 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51397 |
|
24/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
877 |
To Service |
During 09/1880 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/03/1959 |
Service Life |
78 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1913 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1880 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 574 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 877 |
|
|
09/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11397 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51397 |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51397 |
|
|