Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1221 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14627 Week
» 67643 Month
» 187170 Year
» 3214023 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
584 |
|
04/1881 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11424 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51424 |
|
31/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
887 |
To Service |
During 04/1881 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/10/1958 |
Service Life |
77 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1881 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
25D |
|
Mirfield |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1881 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 584 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 887 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11424 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51424 |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
02/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51424 |
|
|