Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
588 |
|
04/1881 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11445 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51445 |
|
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
891 |
To Service |
During 04/1881 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/06/1960 |
Service Life |
79 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1881 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/08/1959 |
Last L.Y.R. 2F 0-6-0ST\'s |
At the time of writing, there are twenty-three ex-L.Y.R. Class 2F 0-6-0STs in stock, including five Departmental locomotives and these are allocated as follows: Edge Hill 51445 (8A), Sutton Oak 51441 (8G), Gorton 51319 (9G), Fleetwood 51336, 51419 an 51524 (24F), Newton Heath 51343 an 51371 (26A), Agecroft 51413 an 51496 (26B), Bolton 51408, 51486 an 51498 (26C), Mirfield 51358 (56D), Crewe Works 51412, 51444 an 51446 (CW), and finally Horwich Works 51429 (HW), plus Service Locos. 11304, 11305, 11324, 11368 an 11394. |
SLS/195910 |
30/04/1960 |
Barton-Wright/Aspinall 2F 0-6-0ST |
A total of twenty Barton-Wright rebuilt Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2F 0-6-0ST locomotives remained in stock by late March, allocated as follows : Edge Hill 51445 (8A), Sutton Oak 51441 (8G), Fleetwood 51336, 51419 an 51524 (24F), Newton Heath 51371 (26A), Agecroft 51413 an 51496 (26B), Bolton 51408, 51486 an 51498 (26C), Crewe Works 51412, 51444 an 51446, and Horwich Works 51429, with Service Stock locos. 11304, 11305, 11324, 11368 an 11394. |
SLS/196006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1881 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 588 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 891 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11445 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51445 |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51445 |
|
|