Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 264 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1965 Week
» 10080 Month
» 137523 Year
» 1802899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 747   04/1881
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 11413   1924
British Railways 51413   18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall
Class 568
Company History LYR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2504/1881
23 (0-6-0ST)09/1895
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 1984
To Service During 04/1881
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1961
Service Life 80 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1881
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 16/06/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   w/e 12/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1915 Reboilered


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/08/1959 Last L.Y.R. 2F 0-6-0ST\'s At the time of writing, there are twenty-three ex-L.Y.R. Class 2F 0-6-0STs in stock, including five Departmental locomotives and these are allocated as follows: Edge Hill 51445 (8A), Sutton Oak 51441 (8G), Gorton 51319 (9G), Fleetwood 51336, 51419 an 51524 (24F), Newton Heath 51343 an 51371 (26A), Agecroft 51413 an 51496 (26B), Bolton 51408, 51486 an 51498 (26C), Mirfield 51358 (56D), Crewe Works 51412, 51444 an 51446 (CW), and finally Horwich Works 51429 (HW), plus Service Locos. 11304, 11305, 11324, 11368 an 11394. SLS/195910
30/04/1960 Barton-Wright/Aspinall 2F 0-6-0ST A total of twenty Barton-Wright rebuilt Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2F 0-6-0ST locomotives remained in stock by late March, allocated as follows : Edge Hill 51445 (8A), Sutton Oak 51441 (8G), Fleetwood 51336, 51419 an 51524 (24F), Newton Heath 51371 (26A), Agecroft 51413 an 51496 (26B), Bolton 51408, 51486 an 51498 (26C), Crewe Works 51412, 51444 an 51446, and Horwich Works 51429, with Service Stock locos. 11304, 11305, 11324, 11368 an 11394. SLS/196006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1881 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 747
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 1984
   
01/1915 Modification Modification: Reboilered    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11413    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
18/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51413    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
12/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 51413    

prev prev