Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 161 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17964 Week
» 70980 Month
» 190507 Year
» 3217360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
761 |
|
09/1881 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11526 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51526 |
|
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
1998 |
To Service |
During 09/1881 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/09/1957 |
Service Life |
76 yrs , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1881 |
24C |
|
Lostock Hall |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/09/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
17/05/1947 |
EXLOAN |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
16/08/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/09/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1881 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 761 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 1998 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11526 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51526 |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51526 |
|
|