Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2935 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16341 Week
» 69357 Month
» 188884 Year
» 3215737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
799 |
|
01/1883 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11404 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51404 |
|
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
975 |
To Service |
During 01/1883 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 19/03/1959 |
Service Life |
76 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1883 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
25F |
|
Low Moor |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
56D |
|
Mirfield |
m/e |
11/10/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/03/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25F |
Low Moor |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
56D |
Mirfield |
5w/e |
04/10/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 799 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 975 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11404 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51404 |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
19/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51404 |
|
|