Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
810 |
|
04/1883 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11510 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51510 |
|
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
986 |
To Service |
During 04/1883 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1955 |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26G |
Belle Vue |
w/e |
04/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1913 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 810 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 986 |
|
|
11/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11510 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51510 |
|
|
04/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G) |
|
|
10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51510 |
|
|