Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 2784 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 18396 Week
» 117041 Month
» 319705 Year
» 3346558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
936 |
|
10/1886 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
12023 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
52023 |
|
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
1206 |
To Service |
During 10/1886 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/04/1950 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1896 |
Reboilered |
03/1899 |
Reboilered |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/05/1948 |
Patricroft MPD |
On 29/5 no fewer than five re-numbered ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's were in the shed viz: Nos.52019/23/24/30/36 |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1886 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 936 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1206 |
|
|
03/1896 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
03/1899 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12023 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52023 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
08/04/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52023 |
|
|