Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Highland Railway |
138 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17697 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57697 |
on |
17/02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Drummond |
Class |
K |
Company History |
HR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3846 |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/02/1951 off Ayr (67C) |
Service Life |
51 yrs , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1900 |
30D |
|
Ayr |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30D |
|
Ayr |
w/e |
03/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/02/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30D |
Ayr |
w/e |
03/01/1948 |
WDN |
67C |
Ayr |
on |
17/02/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/04/1946 |
Northern Division |
St. Roilox Works: Included amongst condemned engines still lying in the scrapyard are: 14328/31/50, 14633/78/92, 15103, 16907/11/26, 17697, 17828, an 17905. The following were recently sent to Kilmarnock for breaking up: 16922, 17696, 17908, an 17957. 15357 is under consideration. |
SLS/194606 |
25/05/1947 |
Corkerhill MPD |
Six of the ex H. Rly. 'Barneys,' viz., Nos. 17694, 17695, 17697, 17698, 17699 and 17702, were seen on shed here on 25/5. Nos. 17695 and 17699 still have the safety valves on the dome, while No. 17697 has a stovepipe chimney. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Highland Railway Number 138 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3846 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17697 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ayr (30D) |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (30D) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57697 from Ayr (67C) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57697 |
|
|