Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 53 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2979 Week
» 4717 Month
» 132160 Year
» 1797536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Caledonian Railway 849 m/e 08/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 17587 y/e 1924
British Railways 57587 w/e 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. McIntosh
Class 812
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4634
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1900
32A   Inverness on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
63C   Oban 4w/e 23/09/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 63C Oban 2w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1911 Steam heating apparatus


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/06/1952 Scottish Miscellany On a trip round the north, quite a variety of locomotives was noted, 55218 was on Aberfeldy Br., No. 44931 was pilot to 54500, 54494 on Up pass. at Murthly and 54467 at Pitlochry. No. 62262 was shunting at Elgin, 54473/82 at Forres, and at Inverness 54445/63/70/1/84 an 57634, 57954 an 73007. 55051 was at Dornoch and it is said locally that C.E. Dept. is to consider possibility of C.R. 0-4-4T as branch engine is getting worn-out. Helmsdale provided 54495, 57587 an 55053, the Dornoch Branch spare engine. Kyle of Lochalsh had only Class 5 LM 4-6-0. The early morning mixed train from Kyle to Dingwall is generally a LM 5MT, brake composite and a string of wagons.
Bl, No. 61140 with self-weighing tender is due in Scotland for test purposes. 'Clan' Class engines have been noted working to Stirling and probably beyond.
SLS/195208
29/06/1961 Highland line With dieselisation of the Thurso branch on Thursday, 29th June, steam haulage north of Helmsdale ceased, although 54482 re-appeared on the branch on 8th July. D5324 was noted on it on 3rd July. Congestion at Inverness on Summer Saturdays is always acute and is made worse by pigeon traffic and station turn-round time being exceeded. Double-heading is necessary between Inverness and Wick on all overweight trains but even so the 6-40 a.m. ex Inverness is a tough proposition-on 1st July it was 445 tone north of Helmsdale and on 15th July consisted of 14 vehicles although relieved by a 5-05 a.m. special. Both were about 1 hour late. Helmsdale shed stables only the diesel workings introduced at Summer t.t. and a 60% train-crew cut has taken place. All the ex-Helmsdale engines are working from Inverness except 54495 which was Dingwall pilot on 3rd July (replacing 54487), 57587 being on station pilot duties and 1646/9 in the yards. 40150 an 54482 were on Wick shed on 3rd July, spare. The diesels noted north of Inverness were mainly 53XX or 51XX. SLS/196108
12/08/1961 Inverness MPD Steam locomotives on Inverness on 12th August were 1646, 40150, 57587 on pilot duties, 54463/91/3, 55216/36, 56305 an 57585 in store. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as Caledonian Railway Number 849
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4634
   
1911 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 17587    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A)    
18/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 57587    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oban (63C)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57587    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev