Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 60 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2986 Week
» 4724 Month
» 132167 Year
» 1797543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Caledonian Railway 854 m/e 08/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 17592 y/e 1924
British Railways 57592   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. McIntosh
Class 812
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4639
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1963
Service Life 63 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1900
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 19/01/1963
66B   Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 12/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 06/03/1963
WDN   on 12/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1911 Steam heating apparatus


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 St. Rollox Works Engines into shops: 1131, 2276, 3868, 4884, 7168, 16321, 16329, 17278, 17322, 17367, 17634, 40688, 40924, 42217, 42877, 44701, 44886, 44970, 44976, 44992, 44996, 44997, 45009, 45084, 45125, 45162, 45432, 45453, 45461, 45463. 45465, 45564, 45692, 54480, 54484, 54488, 54491, 55126, 56346, 57329, 57456, 57580, 57592, 57625. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as Caledonian Railway Number 854
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4639
   
1911 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 17592    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57592    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
12/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 57592    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev