Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 57 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2983 Week
» 4721 Month
» 132164 Year
» 1797540 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Caledonian Railway 855 m/e 08/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 17593 y/e 1924
British Railways 57593   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. McIntosh
Class 812
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4640
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal Mon 20/11/1961
Service Life 61 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1900
28A   Motherwell on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 20/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 20/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1911 Steam heating apparatus


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 40170, 40651/63, 687, 40907/09, 912/22, 1129/34, 41177, 1182, 2691, 42699, 2736, 42749, 2880, 42927, 44699, 44900, 4956, 44959/75, 45029/49, 45117/23/52/72, 45251, 45356/62/63, 45463/64/74/85/90, 45575/79, 45728, 7332, 47540, 14450, 14500/01, 55200, 15203/29, 16152, 56170, 16318, 56320, 16328/34, 17270, 57312, 17437, 17593, 17642. On 12/11, No. 54472, the first ex C.R. locomotive to bear the crest was ex Works. SLS/195001
10/02/1962 Carnbroe dump Carnbroe dump (on former Hamilton NB line adjacent to CR main line): 55201/20/3/65/7/8, 56298/356, 57208/39/68/71/92, 57303/17/9/21/5/63/7/9/89, 57417/8/36/61/3, 57563/4/93, 57632/59/63/5, 68717. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as Caledonian Railway Number 855
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4640
   
1911 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 17593    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57593    
20/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57593    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev