Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 51 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2977 Week
» 4715 Month
» 132158 Year
» 1797534 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Caledonian Railway 858 m/e 08/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 17596 y/e 1924
British Railways 57596   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. McIntosh
Class 812
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4643
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 2 mths , 0 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1900
30A   Corkerhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67C   Ayr 4w/e 23/11/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1911 Steam heating apparatus


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as Caledonian Railway Number 858
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4643
   
1911 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 17596    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57596    
23/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57596    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev