Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 443 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5430 Week
» 13545 Month
» 140988 Year
» 1806364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Caledonian Railway 861 m/e 08/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 17599 y/e 1924
British Railways 57599   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. McIntosh
Class 812
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4646
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal Thu 05/11/1959
Service Life 59 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1900
28A   Motherwell on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 05/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 05/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1911 Steam heating apparatus


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows: Nos. 40604 (3983) 27/8; 40647 (4368) 20/8; *40905 (3787) 17/8; 40908 (3780) 16/8; 41136 (3590) 15/8; 42421 26/8; 42877 (4332) 25/8; 42915 (4016) 30/8; 42918 (3947) 31/8; 44234 (3368) 13/8; 44281 (3415) 10/8; 45005 (9592) 1/9; 45047 (9716) 9/8; 45121 (9826) 22/8; 45455 (9668) 20/8; 45457 (9198) 22/8; 45474 (9820) 11/8; 45483 (9555) 2/9; 45499 (9101) 11/8; 45560 (9062) 6/8; 54446 (6065) 1/9; 54448 (6067) 19/8; 54464 (6170) 12/8; 54465 (6171) 1/9; 54473 (6200) 10/8; 54639 (2678) 18/8; 55164 15/8; 55221 23/8; 56025 19/8; 56155 30/8; 56276 2/9; 57271 (6034) 18/8; 57337 (975) 15/8; 57445 (1243) 3/9; 57453 (1326) 12/8; 57599 (1680) 9/8; *Retains L.M.S. on the tender. With the exception of Nos. 44234, 45047, 45560, 54464, 54639, 55164, 56276, and 57599, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number plates. In addition No. M5693 was re-numbered 45693 on 26/8, and No. 45692 (9710) and No. 57614 (1700) received new smokebox number plates on 20/8 and 23/8 respectively.
No. 56025 went back into service as Works 'pug' on 20/8 and No. 16030 was towed away to Balornock shed on the same date.
No. 55180, one of the engines in the Mail crash, was brought into the shops, ex dump, on 20/8, where it has since been cut-up; No. 5716, the other engine, is still in the dump
SLS/194810
31/12/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as Caledonian Railway Number 861
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4646
   
1911 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 17599    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57599    
05/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 57599    
12/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev