Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16194 Week
» 69210 Month
» 188737 Year
» 3215590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4027 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
British Railways |
44027 |
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
6213 |
To Service |
During 11/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1964 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1924 |
3B |
|
Bushbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3A |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
12F |
|
Workington |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
12F |
Workington |
5w/e |
07/09/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4027 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44027 |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12F) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44027 |
|
|