Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4040 m/e 01/1925
British Railways 44040 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 6213
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/11/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1925
19E   Belle Vue on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/10/1955
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 03/12/1955
21A   Saltley w/e 13/10/1962
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 28/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 28/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4040
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (19E)    
09/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44040    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44040    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev