Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1307 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19110 Week
» 72126 Month
» 191653 Year
» 3218506 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4041 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
British Railways |
44041 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
6213 |
To Service |
During 02/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/06/1964 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4041 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44041 |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (10G) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
04/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44041 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|