Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1035 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14441 Week
» 67457 Month
» 186984 Year
» 3213837 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4048 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
British Railways |
44048 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
6213 |
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1964 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1925 |
17B |
|
Burton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
17A |
|
Derby |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
5E |
|
Alsager |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
5F |
|
Uttoxeter |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
08/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
5E |
Alsager |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
ALLOC |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4048 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Burton (17B) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44048 |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44048 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|