Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4076 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
British Railways |
44076 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1945 |
Manchester (London Road) Station |
Interesting locos seen during October included: 2573 10C, 4848 20A, 4076 2C, 4885 12A, 4901 12A, 4904, 5168 30A, 5284 19E |
SLS/194601 |
12/08/1957 |
Stratford On Avon, S. & M.J.R. |
The former SMJ shed has been completely demolished, leaving only the water tower at the rear. It was officially closed as from 22nd July and the duties and men transferred to the W.R. shed (sub 84E). The shed stood at the site of the new spur (on which work has commenced) which will connect the SMJ line southwards to the W.R. line. Stratford lost its code, 21D, and permanent allocation in February, 1953, since when, several engines from various sheds have stabled overnight and been used by Stratford men for their own turns. Two Class 4F's (43965 and 44463) have been transferred on loan to the W.R. and are at the former GWR shed. They were originally intended for Jamboree traffic but are now to be kept for emergency in case of failure of any LMR engine shedded over-night. On 3rd August, LMR locos. at W.R. shed were 43873, 43967 of 15D, 44076, 44491 of 2E and the two already mentioned. The original S. & M.J.R. signal box at entrance to Town station is also to be demolished-it has been unused for many years. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4076 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44076 |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
13/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44076 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|