Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 15 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4642 Week
» 6380 Month
» 133823 Year
» 1799199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4110 m/e 03/1925
British Railways 44110 w/e 14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1925
19D   Heaton Mersey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16B   Spital Bridge w/e 20/11/1948
16B   Spital Bridge 3w/e 11/12/1948
2E   Northampton w/e 06/02/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 07/05/1960
2E   Northampton w/e 11/06/1960
21B   Bescot w/e 11/04/1961
21D   Aston w/e 10/06/1961
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/07/1962
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 15/09/1962
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16B Spital Bridge w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 2E Northampton 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 28/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1950 Inter regional allocations The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). SLS/195012
01/02/1960 Peterborough Midland Closure Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4110
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D)    
20/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B)    
14/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 44110    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44110    
09/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev