|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/11/1961 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1925 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4118 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) | ||
23/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44118 | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
27/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
22/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (27F) | ||
01/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
15/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
20/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
05/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) | ||
15/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44118 | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |