Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 101 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17904 Week
» 70920 Month
» 190447 Year
» 3217300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4119 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
44119 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 06/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/12/1963 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
19E |
Belle Vue |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
24G |
Skipton |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4119 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44119 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (24G) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44119 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|