|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/04/1961 | Derby Works (Paint Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D210/69, D2501/8, D2903/9, D3126/72, D8006, 11116, 12077, 13119, 13245. Test House: ED2, D24/7, D76, D83, D255/68, D2910, D5015/61/89, D5140, 10203, 11114. New Building: D28-37, Finishing Shop: D74, D223/92, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42077, 42092, 42367, 42414/39, 42522, 43972, 44102, 44284, 44538, 44603, 47675, 48114, 48220/4, 48447, 48695, 53806, 73014/39, 73126/7. Paint Shop: D26, D78, M1000, 44177, 47278, 47318, 48143. In Works Sidings: D68, D86, D88, D3069, D5701, 12000, 41529/36, 41835, 42281, 44067/85/91, 44195, 44269, 47305/24/90, 47533, 48003, 48121, 48336, 48666, 58850, 73157. Ex-Works Shed: D79, D230, D3052, 47415/39, 48063, 48153, 48219, 48690. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1924 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4177 Built at St. Rollox Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) | ||
09/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44177 | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) | ||
25/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
15/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) | ||
04/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
07/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44177 | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |