Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 591 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3517 Week
» 5255 Month
» 132698 Year
» 1798074 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4203 m/e 11/1925
British Railways 44203 w/e 03/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/03/1966
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1925
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21B   Bournville 4w/e 28/12/1957
21A   Saltley w/e 22/11/1958
17C   Rowsley w/e 30/12/1961
17A   Derby w/e 06/01/1962
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 24/03/1962
14E   Bedford w/e 07/04/1962
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 03/08/1963
15C   Kettering w/e 14/09/1963
15E   Coalville w/e 10/10/1964
16G   Westhouses w/e 19/12/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 26/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 26/12/1953
EXLOAN 21A Saltley 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 14E Bedford 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 15C Kettering 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 15E Coalville w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 5w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 26/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Derby Works During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned.
At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic.
SLS/195104
11/02/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. SLS/196003
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
14/08/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4203
Built at St. Rollox Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
03/03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 44203    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15C)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15E)    
19/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
26/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 44203    
06/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev