Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3424 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16830 Week
» 69846 Month
» 189373 Year
» 3216226 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4212 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
British Railways |
44212 |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
6438 |
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1963 |
Service Life |
38 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/11/1942 |
Sheds noted |
4212 (19A), 8198 no plate, 8199 (18A), 4576 (22B), 5428 (10C). |
SLS/194302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4212 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44212 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44212 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|