Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14894 Week
» 67910 Month
» 187437 Year
» 3214290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4218 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
British Railways |
44218 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
6438 |
To Service |
During 01/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/03/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1950 |
Inter regional allocations |
The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). |
SLS/195012 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe North MPD (In Store) |
Ex Works: D239, 41272, 70006. In Store: 71000. 44218, 45567, 46225/48/51carrying yellow stripe on cab sides. |
SLS/196409 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4218 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44218 |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44218 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|