Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 598 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3524 Week
» 5262 Month
» 132705 Year
» 1798081 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4224 m/e 01/1926
British Railways 44224 w/e 24/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 6438
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/02/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1926
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby 4w/e 04/12/1954
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 21/05/1955
18A   Toton 4w/e 28/01/1956
     Withdrawn w/e 03/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   w/e 03/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Derby Works During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned.
At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic.
SLS/195104
01/05/1958 Derby Works (Paint Shop) 1st May. G-General repair, I-Intermediate Repair, L-Lined out. Paint Shop-118 (for cleaning up, fitting motion, etc.), D3509 (new), 12038 I, 44003 G, 44224 I, 44470 I, 48096 G, 47582 G, 73029 GL. Diesel Erecting Shop-E.D.2, D2508 (ex 11147), 10201 casual, 10202 attention to tyres, 12001/95, 13059. New Loco. Construction-D3510 (no. 8) (on test), D3511/2/3/4 (nos. 9, 10, 11, 12), D3515/7 (nos. 13/5) frames set up, D3522/3 (nos. 20/1).- Outside-East end, 11120, ED4 attention to crank pins; West end, 10100 cracked no. 1 AEC auxiliary engine cylinder block; test house, 10203. Erecting Shop no. 1 bay, 40580 G, 40681 G, 41900G, 42349 G, 42452 I, 42540 G, 43913 I, 44605 G, 48362 I, 48510 G, 48772 I, 80047 G, 80050 I; stripping section-42310 G, 48273 G, 48447 I; Erecting Shop no. 2 bay-42527 I, 43885 I, 44416 G, 44534 I; stripping-44561 G; frames only-D3516 (no. 14), D3518/9/20/1 (nos. 16/7/8/9) of Lot D658; Erecting Shop no. 3 bay-(new work, main line diesel) Lot B251, nos. 1-7, (Bo-Bo), (D5000-6). No Sulzer engine finally in position yet. No. 1 (D1 on welding jig), 1-Co-Co-1. Yard-40047, 40447 (submitted for cut-up from Crewe), 40680, 41066 (Exam.), 41086 (cut-up), 41980 (Exam.), 43332 (Exam.), 47004 G, 47218 I, 47290 G, 47488 I, 53800 (waiting cyls.), 73072, 75019. SLS/195805
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4224
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
24/03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 44224    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
03/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 44224    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev