|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Belle Vue MPD | The following interesting visitors were noted during January: 2829 (21A); 3319 (16B); 3982 (15A); 3615 (4A); 4853 (20A), 5298 (8A); 12861 (23B). During February: 3231 (20G); 3335 (20G); 3454 (15D); 3620 (21A); 3859 (16B); 4045 (22B); 4186 (21A); 4292 (11E). On 9/2 6132 (20A) passed through on an express travelling in the direction of Manchester Victoria. | SLS/194604 |
10/12/1960 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4292 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Tebay (11E) | ||
06/05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44292 | ||
26/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
12/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
06/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Workington (11B) | ||
10/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44292 | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |