Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4302 m/e 10/1926
British Railways 44302 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/03/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1926
3D   Aston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12F   Workington w/e 19/11/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 17/06/1961
21B   Bescot w/e 15/07/1961
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/08/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 21/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12F Workington 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 21B Bescot 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   w/e 21/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4302
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D)    
12/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44302    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
21/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44302    
04/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev